MN SF2186 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Author added Eken
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Author added Eken
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Endow Minnesota program to provide income tax credits to encourage charitable contributions establishment and appropriation
Title
Endow Minnesota program to provide income tax credits to encourage charitable contributions establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] | Sen. Erik Simonson [D] |
Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Author added Eken |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Author added Simonson |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Authors added Senjem; Franzen |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2339 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Author added Marquart.