MN SF2226 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus agriculture department, rural development, and housing finance bill
Title
Omnibus agriculture department, rural development, and housing finance bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 99 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Theis - Amendment - S2226A31 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Lueck - Amendment - S2226A34 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Anderson - Amendment - S2226A12 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Anderson - Amendment - S2226A30 (Y: 52 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Kiel - Amendment - S2226A9 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Poston - Amendment - S2226A8 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Anderson - Amendment to Anderson Amendment - S2226A16 (Y: 52 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Lueck - Amendment to Poppe Amendment - S2226A48 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 99 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Theis - Amendment - S2226A31 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Lueck - Amendment - S2226A34 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Anderson - Amendment - S2226A12 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Anderson - Amendment - S2226A30 (Y: 52 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Kiel - Amendment - S2226A9 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Poston - Amendment - S2226A8 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Anderson - Amendment to Anderson Amendment - S2226A16 (Y: 52 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Lueck - Amendment to Poppe Amendment - S2226A48 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-05-20 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2019-05-20 | House | Motion to refuse to concur |
2019-05-20 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2019-05-20 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Third reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2019-05-06 | House | House conferee change Delete Vang, insert Lippert |
2019-05-06 | Senate | House conferee change Lippert replaces Vang |
2019-05-01 | House | House conferees Poppe, Hausman, Pelowski, Vang, Gunther |
2019-05-01 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2019-05-01 | House | Senate conferees Westrom, Weber, Goggin, Draheim, Dziedzic |
2019-05-01 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2019-05-01 | Senate | House conferees Poppe; Hausman; Pelowski; Vang; Gunther |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate conferees Westrom; Weber; Goggin; Draheim; Dziedzic |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2019-04-26 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-04-26 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-04-26 | House | Amended |
2019-04-24 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 26, 2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-23 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2200 |
2019-04-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Author added Weber |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2200 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Authors added Hausman, Howard, and Fischer