MN SF2255 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Metropolitan council additional investment authority authorization
Title
Metropolitan council additional investment authority authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Kent [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 73 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Secretary of State Chapter 292 | |
2014-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Third reading vote: 34-24 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2014-05-15 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 73-57 |
2014-05-15 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-05-15 | House | Amended |
2014-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | House | Second reading |
2014-05-13 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-05-12 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with HF2319 |
2014-05-12 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-05-12 | House | Motion to recall |
2014-05-09 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Education Policy |
2014-05-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 34-22 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |