MN SF2352 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2354
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2354
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Registration of Canadian Money Judgements Act
Title
Uniform Registration of Canadian Money Judgements Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2354 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2354 (Similar To) 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 81