MN SF2399 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2840
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - HF substituted on General Orders HF2840
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Rice county district one hospital district private sale of land authorization and hospital district dissolution requirement
Title
Rice county district one hospital district private sale of land authorization and hospital district dissolution requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF2840 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |