MN SF2399 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2363
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2363
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act
Title
Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2363 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chief author added Franzen |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chief author stricken Hayden |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2363 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 192