MN SF242 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Online personal finance class for high school graduation requirement
Title
Online personal finance class for high school graduation requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education Policy |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1599 (Similar To) 2023-02-20 - Author added Knudsen