MN SF2563 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-06 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-06 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Water and soil resources board (BWSR) Minnesota River basin goals and strategies coordination directive and appropriation
Title
Water and soil resources board (BWSR) Minnesota River basin goals and strategies coordination directive and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Energy |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3677 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Author added Fischer.