MN SF2587 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing infrastructure bonds eligible use expansion and issuance regulation
Title
Housing infrastructure bonds eligible use expansion and issuance regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Authors added Rosen; Dahms |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3143 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Second reading