MN SF26 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Right to vote restoration to individuals convicted of a felony upon completion of any term of incarceration imposed and executed by a court for the offense
Title
Right to vote restoration to individuals convicted of a felony upon completion of any term of incarceration imposed and executed by a court for the offense
Sponsors
Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
Sen. Clare Oumou Verbeten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Authors added Latz; Oumou Verbeten |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authors added Marty; Mann |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Elections |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF28 (Similar To) 2023-03-03 - Secretary of State Chapter 12