MN SF2601 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Authors added Laine; Cwodzinski
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Authors added Laine; Cwodzinski
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Semiautomatic firearm slide-fire stock defined as trigger activator
Title
Semiautomatic firearm slide-fire stock defined as trigger activator
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Authors added Laine; Cwodzinski |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2781 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Author added Ecklund.