MN SF2611 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer care specialists to remove dead human bodies from the place of death authorization; registration of transfer care specialists by the commissioner of health establishment; mortuary science fee authorization
Title
Transfer care specialists to remove dead human bodies from the place of death authorization; registration of transfer care specialists by the commissioner of health establishment; mortuary science fee authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Author added Drazkowski |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Authors added Rarick; Rasmusson |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2509 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Author added Dotseth