MN SF2718 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 202 05/06/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 202 05/06/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Judicial standards board monthly district judge review requirement
Title
Judicial standards board monthly district judge review requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Secretary of State Chapter 202 05/06/14 | |
2014-05-08 | Governor's action Approval 05/06/14 | |
2014-05-05 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Returned from House |
2014-05-02 | House | Bill was passed vote: 120-0 |
2014-05-02 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-30 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 2, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2687 |
2014-04-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 58-0 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |