MN SF2752 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 338 05/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 338 05/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Lower St. Croix River area land use modifications
Title
Lower St. Croix River area land use modifications
Sponsors
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Sen. Kathy Saltzman [D] | Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] | Sen. Dan Skogen [D] |
Sen. Raymond Vandeveer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Secretary of State Chapter 338 05/13/10 | |
2010-05-14 | Governor's action Approval 05/13/10 | |
2010-05-13 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-11 | Senate: Returned from House | |
2010-05-11 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-05-11 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-10 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-05-10 | House: Third reading | |
2010-05-04 | Senate: Author added Vandeveer | |
2010-05-03 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-19 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-19 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-15 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-15 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3152 | |
2010-04-15 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2010-03-17 | Senate: Author stricken Sieben | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |