MN SF285 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Author added Gazelka
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Author added Gazelka
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Small business investment tax credit provisions modification
Title
Small business investment tax credit provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Lyle Koenen [D] |
Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Author added Gazelka |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Author added Koenen |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |