MN SF2851 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Soft body armor reimbursement grants eligibility expansion
Title
Soft body armor reimbursement grants eligibility expansion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2867 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Author added Edelson