MN SF302 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dental plan contracts and provider audits regulation
Title
Dental plan contracts and provider audits regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Vandeveer [R] | Sen. David Hann [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] | Sen. Dave Brown [R] |
Sen. John Howe [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. John Ward [D] | Rep. Carol McFarlane [R] |
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Tom Anzelc [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Kim Norton [D] |
Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Rep. Kory Kath [D] | Rep. Katherine Knuth [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Pat Mazorol [R] | Rep. Kirk Stensrud [R] |
Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Nora Slawik [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Governor approval | |
2011-05-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 64 | |
2011-05-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2011-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Returned from House |
2011-05-20 | House | Bill was passed vote: 133-0 |
2011-05-20 | House | Third reading |
2011-05-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-18 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-18 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Author added Howe |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF122 |
2011-05-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 53-0 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-03-07 | Senate | Author stricken Scheid |
2011-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2011-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |