MN SF3085 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - HF substituted on General Orders HF3252
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - HF substituted on General Orders HF3252
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans brokers examination licensing experience waiver requirement
Title
Veterans brokers examination licensing experience waiver requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF3252 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Commerce |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3252 (Similar To) 2016-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 90 04/29/16