MN SF3085 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Outdoor heritage fund appropriations and appropriation modifications
Title
Outdoor heritage fund appropriations and appropriation modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] |
Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3128 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan