MN SF3392 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MNsure operations funding and health carriers and plans certification authority modifications; federal waivers and approvals submission deadline requirement; human services commissioner risk-bearing limitations imposition
Title
MNsure operations funding and health carriers and plans certification authority modifications; federal waivers and approvals submission deadline requirement; human services commissioner risk-bearing limitations imposition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Comm report: Amend previous comm report Joint rule 2.03 Suspended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3543 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means