MN SF34 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Casey Jones trail extension; Des Moines River valley trail establishment
Title
Casey Jones trail extension; Des Moines River valley trail establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-30 | House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance | |
2009-03-30 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-03-30 | House: Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division | |
2009-03-26 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-03-23 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2009-03-09 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-03-09 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-01-08 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |