MN SF3409 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4406
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4406
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Miscellaneous corrections to laws and statutes
Title
Miscellaneous corrections to laws and statutes
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4406 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4406 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 55