MN SF3532 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prior authorization and coverage of health services requirements modification; ground for disciplinary action against physicians modification; commissioner of commerce and legislature report requirements; classifying data
Title
Prior authorization and coverage of health services requirements modification; ground for disciplinary action against physicians modification; commissioner of commerce and legislature report requirements; classifying data
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Authors added Wiklund; Klein; Mann; Abeler |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3578 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Author added Virnig