MN SF3534 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Author added Limmer
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Author added Limmer
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School Resource Officers; public safety provided, grounds for use of reasonable force in schools modified, school resource officer duties defined and minimum training requirements established, school resource officer model policy development required, and money appropriated
Title
School Resource Officers; public safety provided, grounds for use of reasonable force in schools modified, school resource officer duties defined and minimum training requirements established, school resource officer model policy development required, and money appropriated
Sponsors
Sen. Bonnie Westlin [D] | Sen. Judy Seeberger [D] | Sen. Rob Kupec [D] | Sen. Heather Gustafson [D] |
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Author added Limmer |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Education Policy |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3489 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 78