MN SF3581 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added Bigham; Housley
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Authors added Bigham; Housley
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Additional entities permission to provide copies of certain driver and vehicle records
Title
Additional entities permission to provide copies of certain driver and vehicle records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Authors added Bigham; Housley |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4163 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy