MN SF362 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - Author added Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - Author added Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Honor and Remember Flag designation as a symbol of recognition and honor for fallen military service members
Title
Veterans Honor and Remember Flag designation as a symbol of recognition and honor for fallen military service members
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Anderson [R] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Sen. Alice Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Senate | Author added Johnson |
2015-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2015-05-15 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-05-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF146 |
2015-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 61-0 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Special Order |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF146 (Similar To) 2015-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed