MN SF3633 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-22 - Author added Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-22 - Author added Wiger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Plan appropriation to ensure that Minnesota has an abundant supply of clean water for the next 50 years
Title
Plan appropriation to ensure that Minnesota has an abundant supply of clean water for the next 50 years
Sponsors
Sen. Jen McEwen [D] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. Ann Johnson Stewart [D] |
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1 (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-22 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2022-05-22 | Senate | Author stricken Marty |
2022-05-22 | Senate | Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Author added Johnson Stewart |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3888 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Author added Schultz