MN SF3748 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Hayden
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Hayden
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Intensive youth mental health client retention program establishment and appropriation
Title
Intensive youth mental health client retention program establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Author added Hayden |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3910 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Author added Theis