MN SF393 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Retired firefighters special motor vehicle license plates
Title
Retired firefighters special motor vehicle license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2011-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2011-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |