MN SF3950 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Johnson Stewart
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Johnson Stewart
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Migration Act establishment
Title
Minnesota Migration Act establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Author added Johnson Stewart |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3850 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law