MN SF3986 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Early childhood education workforce study appropriation
Title
Early childhood education workforce study appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Author added Wiklund |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4278 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Author added Olson, L.