MN SF4012 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Hauschild
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Hauschild
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prompt payment of emergency room and ambulance charges incurred by patients enrolled in very high deductible health plans alternative mechanism provision
Title
Prompt payment of emergency room and ambulance charges incurred by patients enrolled in very high deductible health plans alternative mechanism provision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Author added Hauschild |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Author added Kunesh |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3840 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy