MN SF4023 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Clausen
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Clausen
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
University of Minnesota campus safety supplemental financing appropriation
Title
University of Minnesota campus safety supplemental financing appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2723 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy