MN SF4027 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Jobs and Economic Development policy bill
Title
Omnibus Jobs and Economic Development policy bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-18 | House | Second reading |
2024-05-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-05-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2024-05-17 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2024-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-09 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2024-04-08 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3448 |
2024-04-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Special Order |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Development |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3448 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Author added Noor (as Chief)