MN SF4038 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Author added Eichorn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Author added Eichorn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Classifying certain forest industry data provision
Title
Classifying certain forest industry data provision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Author added Eichorn |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3461 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy