MN SF4071 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Seventh consecutive day of work overtime pay requirement provision
Title
Seventh consecutive day of work overtime pay requirement provision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Author added Kunesh |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Labor |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4478 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy