MN SF416 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Website accessibility resource for people with disabilities appropriation
Title
Website accessibility resource for people with disabilities appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Technology and Reform Policy |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF35 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy