MN SF4201 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Author added Latz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Author added Latz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Name of competency attainment board modification
Title
Name of competency attainment board modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Chief author added Westlin |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Chief author stricken Latz |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4109, SF indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4109 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 105