MN SF4214 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Additional investment authority provision for certain self-insurance pools and qualifying governments
Title
Additional investment authority provision for certain self-insurance pools and qualifying governments
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Local Government Policy |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4345 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Second reading