MN SF424 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Dibble
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Dibble
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
City creation of land-value taxation districts authorization
Title
City creation of land-value taxation districts authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Author added Dibble |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF105 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Author added Gomez