MN SF4314 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Latz
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Latz
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coerced debt provisions modification
Title
Coerced debt provisions modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4347 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Second reading