MN SF4480 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Indian Family Preservation Act modification
Title
Minnesota Indian Family Preservation Act modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Author added Hauschild |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4838 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration