MN SF453 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - HF substituted on General Orders HF630
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - HF substituted on General Orders HF630
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus early childhood through grade 12 education budget bill
Title
Omnibus early childhood through grade 12 education budget bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF630 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: Re-referred to Finance |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |