MN SF4796 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin County's authority to contract with entities employing persons eligible for public assistance or otherwise requiring rehabilitative services modification
Title
Hennepin County's authority to contract with entities employing persons eligible for public assistance or otherwise requiring rehabilitative services modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Author added Champion |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4339 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy