MN SF5 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - HF substituted on General Orders HF9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - HF substituted on General Orders HF9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical assistance (MA) eligibility modification; federal Affordable Care Act (ACA) definition and application; appropriation
Title
Medical assistance (MA) eligibility modification; federal Affordable Care Act (ACA) definition and application; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] | Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] |
Sen. Foung Hawj [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF9 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Authors added Champion; Hawj |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Author added Hayden |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |