MN SF541 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 42 05/07/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 42 05/07/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus liquor bill
Title
Omnibus liquor bill
Sponsors
Sen. James Metzen [D] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 103 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 21 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 5 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 21 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 5 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Secretary of State Chapter 42 05/07/13 | |
2013-05-10 | Governor's action Approval 05/07/13 | |
2013-05-07 | Governor approval | |
2013-05-03 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third reading vote: 57-4 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2013-05-01 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 103-24 |
2013-05-01 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-05-01 | House | House rule 2.05, member excused from voting Anderson, M. |
2013-05-01 | House | Amended |
2013-04-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 1, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-04-17 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF746 |
2013-04-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 61-4 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Commerce |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |