MN SF548 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Senate file first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
Pending: House Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Senate file first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
Pending: House Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Pollution control products cost recovery establishment; public utilities commission (PUC) multiyear rate plan approval authorization
Title
Pollution control products cost recovery establishment; public utilities commission (PUC) multiyear rate plan approval authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
2011-04-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 57-0 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | General Orders: To pass |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |