MN SF558 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Secretary of State Chapter 21 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Secretary of State Chapter 21 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public procurement actions original jurisdiction granted to district courts
Title
Public procurement actions original jurisdiction granted to district courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Secretary of State Chapter 21 05/09/2019 | |
2019-05-13 | Governor's action Approval 05/09/2019 | |
2019-05-09 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-09 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Returned from House |
2019-05-07 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 07, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-08 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF300 |
2019-04-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Local Government |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF300 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - HF indefinitely postponed