MN SF607 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Careers Foundation Helmets to Hard Hats appropriation
Title
Construction Careers Foundation Helmets to Hard Hats appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Goggin [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF678 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Author added Dettmer