MN SF70 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Author added Fateh
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Author added Fateh
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Food packaging containing PFAS prohibition
Title
Food packaging containing PFAS prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Karla Bigham [D] | Sen. Jen McEwen [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] |
Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Author added Fateh |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF79 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Author added Feist